Kwiatkoski, Morgan Margaret (CPSO#: 95199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverview Medical Lower Level
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone: (519) 787-1200
Fax: (519) 787-1803
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morgan Kwiatkoski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kwiatkoski ( CPSO# 95199 )

Business Address:
Lower Level
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone Number: (519) 787-1200

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORGAN MARGARET KWIATKOSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWIATKOSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013