Kwitko, Marvin Leo (CPSO#: 16157)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2000