Kwok, Eva (CPSO#: 68120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 311
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 321-2879
Fax: (416) 321-2855
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eva Kwok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kwok ( CPSO# 68120 )

Business Address:
311 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 321-2879

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVA KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1998