Kwok, Jason Wing-Goon (CPSO#: 73457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Names: Kwok, Jason Wing Goon (used until: 25 Jul 2001 )     Kwok, Wing Goon (used until: 28 Jun 2000 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 339
First Commercial Place
4168 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 5H6
Phone: (416) 291-0051
Fax: (416) 291-0552
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON WING-GOON KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001