Kwok, Jimmy Chee Wai (CPSO#: 65612)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2002