Kwok, Raphael Man Bun (CPSO#: 59814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 217
2375 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1S 3L6
Phone: (416) 291-9552
Fax: (416) 291-7139
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raphael Kwok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kwok ( CPSO# 59814 )

Business Address:
2375 Brimley Road
Unit 217, 2nd Floor
Scarborough ON  M1S 3L6
Phone Number: (416) 291-9552

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAPHAEL MAN BUN KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1989