Kwok, Trevor Pak Hai (CPSO#: 58551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
15 Mountain Avenue South
Suite 210
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone: (905) 664-8599
Fax: (905) 664-1140
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Trevor Kwok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kwok ( CPSO# 58551 )

Business Address:
15 Mountain Avenue South
Suite 210
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone Number: (905) 664-8315

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TREVOR PAK HAI KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1989