Kwok-Liu, Josephine Po-Yee (CPSO#: 29730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1977

Summary

Former Name: Liu, Josephine Po-Yee Kwok (used until: 29 Feb 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Radiology
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y4
Phone: (905) 522-4941 Ext. 33110
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Imagus Inc Medical Imaging
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite G 2-4-6
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 528-1465
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Kwok-Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )

Business Address:
G2 - 4 - 6
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. S. Athreya ( CPSO# 88609 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G1 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPHINE PO-YEE KWOK-LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK-LIU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1977