Kwon, Sarah (CPSO#: 91454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1371 Neilson Road, Unit 302
Scarborough, Ontario
M1B 4Z8
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-110
Fax: (416) 281-1105
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
Emergency Medicine Dept.
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH KWON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2015 to 15 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2015