Kwong, Eugene Cheuk Kun (CPSO#: 76530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6/F
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 673-9496
Fax: (416) 438-0448
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENE CHEUK KUN KWONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2003