Kwong, Jeffrey Cheng Yu (CPSO#: 76444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Family Health Team
399 Bathurst Street
Room 2W404
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888 Ext. 1
Fax: (416) 603-5821
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ICES
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room G1-06
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4055 Ext. 7665
Fax: (416) 480-6048
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey C. Kwong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kwong ( CPSO# 76444 )

Business Address:
Family Health Centre
2W404 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Business Address:
G1-06 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY CHENG YU KWONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003