Kwong, Vincent Sui Wa (CPSO#: 66611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit F33 (2nd Floor)
4300 Steeles Ave East
Markham ON  L3R 0Y5
Phone: 905-6047889
Fax: 905-6047890
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT SUI WA KWONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1995