Kydd, David William (CPSO#: 67892)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Neuropathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Neuropathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Neuropathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998