Kyeremanteng, Kwadwo Sakyi (CPSO#: 83159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 78940
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kyeremanteng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011


Corporation Name: Kyeremanteng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kyeremanteng ( CPSO# 83159 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KWADWO SAKYI KYEREMANTENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYEREMANTENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009