Kylathu, Ranjit Isaac (CPSO#: 72820)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Andhra University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Electoral District: 09

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001