Kyle, Bradley Phillips (CPSO#: 96964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Aureus University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Paterson Medical Centre
1 - 45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-3021
Fax: (807) 468-6964
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 Sylvan St.
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: (807) 468-3638
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bradley Phillips Kyle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kyle ( CPSO# 96964 )

Business Address:
Paterson Medical Centre
45 Wolsley Street
Suite 1
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-3021

Business Address:
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY PHILLIPS KYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 13 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2013