Kyrillos, Edmond (CPSO#: 87190)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edmond Kyrillos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Tel: 1 888 781 9083 Fax: 1 866 297 9338 email: medicalrecords@docudavit.com
Instructions: For further information, you may contact Caremedics Elmvale. Unit 18 1910 St Laurent Boulevard Ottawa, ON K1G 1A4 Tel: 613 523 5550 Fax: 613 523 5580
Date Received: 16 Sep 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2016