Kyskan, Robert (CPSO#: 92634)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Road Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 27 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Apr 2010 to 09 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2013 to 21 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015