First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jan 2017 |