La Belle, Timothy David (CPSO#: 58548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1094 JEFFERSON COURT
NEWBURGH IN  47630
United States
Phone: (812) 962-8881
Fax: (812) 962-8881

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana
USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY DAVID LA BELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LA BELLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2011