La Croix, Eileen Louise (CPSO#: 68803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4693
Fax: (416) 480-5318
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4623
Fax: (416) 480-5144
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EILEEN LOUISE LA CROIX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LA CROIX is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Apr 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 May 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2001