LaBerge, Lauren Elizabeth (CPSO#: 86862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Fratesi, Lauren Elizabeth (used until: 17 Nov 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 209
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: (613) 680-9093
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

170 East St., suite 102
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Canada
Phone: 705-253-0881
Fax: 705-253-8272
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Ottawa Hospital Parkdale Clinic
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4774
Fax: (613) 761-5093
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.C. LaBerge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. LaBerge ( CPSO# 86862 )
Dr. R. LaBerge ( CPSO# 82516 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600


Corporation Name: Dr. Lauren LaBerge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. LaBerge ( CPSO# 86862 )
Dr. R. LaBerge ( CPSO# 82516 )

Business Address:
209 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 680-9092

Business Address:
102 - 170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 253-0881

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN ELIZABETH LABERGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABERGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012