LaBerge, Robert Clarence (CPSO#: 82516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2108
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

770 Broadview Ave.
Suite 205
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Canada
Phone: (613) 729-1324
Fax: (613) 729-5870
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.C. LaBerge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. LaBerge ( CPSO# 82516 )
Dr. L. LaBerge ( CPSO# 86862 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600


Corporation Name: Dr. Lauren LaBerge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. LaBerge ( CPSO# 82516 )
Dr. L. LaBerge ( CPSO# 86862 )

Business Address:
209 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 680-9092

Business Address:
102 - 170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 253-0881

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT CLARENCE LABERGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABERGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2009