LaBossiere, Joseph Roland Harold (CPSO#: 104939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Urology
Suite MG-408
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ROLAND HAROLD LABOSSIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABOSSIERE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Oct 2014 to 02 Nov 2014
Elective Trainee - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016