LaHaye, Stephen Andrew (CPSO#: 68119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Johnson 1
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2155
Fax: (613) 544-4749
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen A. LaHaye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. LaHaye ( CPSO# 68119 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Johnson 1
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN ANDREW LAHAYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAHAYE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1998