LaPierre, David Philippe (CPSO#: 93683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Community
Health Centres
150 Richmond Street
Chatham ON  N7M 1N9
Phone: (519) 397-5455
Fax: (519) 397-5497
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Meadow Park Nursing Home
110 Sandys Street
Chatham ON  N7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: (519) 351-1330
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

190 Stanley Ave
Chatham ON  N7M 3J9
Canada
Phone: (519) 354-2273
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David LaPierre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. LaPierre ( CPSO# 93683 )

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Community Health Centre
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9

Business Address:
190 Stanley Avenue
Chatham ON  N7M 3J9

Business Address:
34 Wellington Street East
Chatham ON  N7M 3N7

Business Address:
110 Sandys Street
Chatham ON  N7L 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 351-1330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID PHILIPPE LAPIERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPIERRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2013