Laakso, Anna-Maria (CPSO#: 96166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Soviero, Anna-Maria (used until: 04 Mar 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph`s Hospital 2 North
Box 3251
35 Algoma St. North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone: 807-343-2462
Fax: 807-345-0972
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Laakso Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Laakso ( CPSO# 96166 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital 5 South
Box 3251
35 Algoma Street North
5 South
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone Number: (807) 343-2446

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA-MARIA LAAKSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAAKSO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013