Laba, Joanna Marie (CPSO#: 93074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8650
Fax: (519) 685-8627
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. M. Laba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Laba ( CPSO# 93074 )

Business Address:
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8650

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA MARIE LABA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 08 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 08 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016