Labbe, Lionel Joseph (CPSO#: 24558)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management, Unit 13, 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON, M9L 0A3, tina@recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 24 May 2016


Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093 www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 04 Dec 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016