Labelle, Alain (CPSO#: 54528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Montreal, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6501
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bourget Labelle Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Labelle ( CPSO# 54528 )
Dr. D. Bourget ( CPSO# 54525 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAIN LABELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABELLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1987