Labinaz, Marino (CPSO#: 58465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 Ruskin Street
University of Ottawa Heart Insitute
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: 6136967296
Fax: 6136967131
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marino Labinaz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Labinaz ( CPSO# 58465 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-5387

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARINO LABINAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABINAZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1988