Labrecque, Paul Anthony (CPSO#: 68905)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jan 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2004