Labrosse, Josee Lynne (CPSO#: 59381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1048 North River Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 3V4
Phone: (613) 842-8187
Fax: (613) 842-8188
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEE LYNNE LABROSSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABROSSE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1989