Labrosse, Joseph Claude Simeon (CPSO#: 16235)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Mar 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1957
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 May 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1990