Labruzzo, Peter (CPSO#: 64967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
729 Devonshire Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 5R3
Phone: (519) 533-5485
Fax: (519) 533-6444
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Labruzzo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Labruzzo ( CPSO# 64967 )

Business Address:
729 Devonshire Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 5R3
Phone Number: (519) 533-5485

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER LABRUZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABRUZZO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993