Labuda, Anna (CPSO#: 82449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
L6M 0L8
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 338-4453
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lower Level Unit 1
107 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Canada
Phone: (905) 628-0840
Fax: (905) 628-0843
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Joseph's Healthcare
Hamilton ON  L9H 1V1
Canada
Phone: (905) 628-0840
Fax: (905) 628-0843
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA LABUDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABUDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011