Lacey, Glen Warren (CPSO#: 67159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Radiology Associates
Suite 101
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 428-0444
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 433-4305
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Taunton Health Center
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
Phone: (905) 721-7702
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Thistlewood Diagnostic Associates
8077 Islington
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-7061
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Durham Radiology Associates
Suite 1101
222 king Street East
Bowmanville ON  L4L 7X7
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-4512
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.W.Lacey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lacey ( CPSO# 67159 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Suite 110
8077 Islington Avenue West
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone Number: (905) 856-7061

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 686-6411

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 686-6411

Business Address:
45 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 686-6411


Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. V. Massaad ( CPSO# 75329 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. G. Lacey ( CPSO# 67159 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLEN WARREN LACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1993