Lacey, Lawrence (CPSO#: 25885)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Apr 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE LACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2000