Lacey, Martin St John (CPSO#: 63260)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 May 2007


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 May 2007