Lachapelle, Kevin Robert (CPSO#: 68787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
1 Frankford Crescent
Trenton ON  K8V 6H8
Phone: (613) 965-5777
Fax: (613) 965-5756
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Lachapelle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lachapelle ( CPSO# 68787 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
1 Frankford Crescent
Trenton ON  K8V 6H8
Phone Number: (613) 965-5777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT LACHAPELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACHAPELLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000