Lacourciere, Helene (CPSO#: 20439)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Mar 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012