Lacroix, Linda Anne Marie (CPSO#: 71894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Road
1B308
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621 Ext. 2716
Fax: (613) 907-8023
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Lacroix Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lacroix ( CPSO# 71894 )

Business Address:
Montford Hospital
713 Chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA ANNE MARIE LACROIX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACROIX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1997