Lacroix, Luc Philippe Joseph (CPSO#: 63413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUC PHILIPPE JOSEPH LACROIX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACROIX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1991

Concerns

Source: Other Canadian Colleges
Active Date: April 26, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On May 25, 2016, the Disciplinary Board of the Collège des médecins du Québec (CMQ) found Dr. Lacroix guilty of failing to behave in an irreproachable manner towards a patient by physically and verbally assaulting the patient during a clinical procedure at a hospital, contrary to Article 17 of the Code of Ethics of Physicians (Quebec). The sanction for this finding was imposed on March 9, 2017 by the Disciplinary Board of the CMQ; Dr. Lacroix was struck from the CMQ’s register (i.e. suspended from practising medicine in Quebec) for a period of 15 months. They also recommended that Dr. Lacroix enroll in courses on interpersonal relationships and anger management in 2017. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on April 26, 2017.