Lacroix, Thomas Bernard (CPSO#: 71830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Clair Corporate Centre
Suite 110
265 North Front Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 7X1
Phone: (519) 344-4868
Fax: (519) 344-4848
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS BERNARD LACROIX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACROIX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1997