Lad, Mohanlal Bhulabhai (CPSO#: 28772)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Nov 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Nov 2012

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Feb 2005
Summary:

 On February 22, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Lad committed an act of professional 
 misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33, of Ontario Regulation No. 856/93, made under the
Medicine Act, 
 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act relevent to the practice ofmedicine that, having 
 regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable, or unprofessional (rude, inappropriate and abusive statements he made to a minor 
 patient).

Therefore the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. 	The Registrar 
 suspend Dr. Mohanlal Bhulabhai Lad’s Certificate of Registration for a period of two months, 
 commencing on March 1, 2005.

2.	The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and 
 limitations on Dr. Mohanlal Bhulabhai Lad’s Certificate of Registration:

(a)	Dr. Lad is required 
 to successfully complete, at his own expense, within six months of the finding of professional 
 misconduct:

(i)	the College’s course “Physician–Patient Communication and Interviewing Skills”; 
 and
(ii)	the College’s course “Medical Ethics”.

3.	Dr. Mohanlal Bhulabhai Lad attend before the 
 Discipline Committee to be reprimanded and that the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the 
 Public Register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 22, 2005