Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lad, Rameeta Jane (CPSO#: 68118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 428
2289 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2E3
Phone: (905) 681-1103
Fax: (905) 681-0052
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rameeta Lad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lad ( CPSO# 68118 )

Business Address:
Unit 428
2289 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2E3
Phone Number: (905) 681-1103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMEETA JANE LAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998