Lad, Tara Lynne (CPSO#: 77400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
106-170 Rockhaven Lane
Waterdown ON  L8B 1B5
Phone: (905) 390-3033
Fax: (905) 390-2999
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lad-Todd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lad ( CPSO# 77400 )
Dr. D. Todd ( CPSO# 75965 )

Business Address:
106 - 170 Rockhaven Lane
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H6
Phone Number: (905) 390-3033

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA LYNNE LAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 29 Apr 2002 to 24 May 2002
Elective Trainee - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
Elective Trainee - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2004

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 10, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)