Ladha, Al-Karim (CPSO#: 70196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
2200 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone: (905) 637-8672
Fax: (905) 639-3076
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Karim Ladha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ladha ( CPSO# 70196 )

Business Address:
204 - 2200 Fairview Street
Halton Hills ON  L7R 4H9
Phone Number: (905) 637-8672

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AL-KARIM LADHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LADHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Apr 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001