Ladha, Alysha (CPSO#: 93858)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Bloorview Kids
Rehabilitation Hospital
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Developmental Paediatrics Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALYSHA LADHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LADHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2015