Ladhani, Moyez Bahadurali Amarshi Mawji (CPSO#: 61101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
H.S.C. 3A95
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75639
Fax: (905) 521-4980
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moyez B. Ladhani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ladhani ( CPSO# 61101 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
HSC3A95
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 26 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOYEZ BAHADURALI AMARSHI MAWJI LADHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LADHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 1994 to 19 Aug 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990